TX HCR137 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commemorating the 25th anniversary of the unconventional ratification of the 27th Amendment to the United States Constitution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commemorating the 25th anniversary of the unconventional ratification of the 27th Amendment to the United States Constitution.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-28HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-25HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24SenateAdopted
2017-05-24SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-24SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-23SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-05-23SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-11SenateReferred to Administration
2017-05-11SenateRead first time
2017-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-05HouseAdopted
2017-05-05HouseRules suspended
2017-05-03HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback