TX HCR114 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Pastor Robbie Keith Caldwell on his 50 years in the ministry.
Title
Congratulating Pastor Robbie Keith Caldwell on his 50 years in the ministry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-04-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-04-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-04-12 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Read & adopted |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-06 | House | Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-03-21 | House | Filed |