TX HCR109 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-22 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-22 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to encourage the Department of Defense to relocate the United States Africa Command to Ellington Field Joint Reserve Base in Houston.
Title
Urging Congress to encourage the Department of Defense to relocate the United States Africa Command to Ellington Field Joint Reserve Base in Houston.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2015-05-22 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2015-05-20 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-20 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-19 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-19 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-05-14 | House | Placed on Resolutions Calendar |
2015-05-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-23 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2015-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-13 | House | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select |
2015-04-06 | House | Filed |
Subjects
DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES
ELLINGTON FIELD JOINT RESERVE BASE
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
UNITED STATES AFRICA COMMAND
ELLINGTON FIELD JOINT RESERVE BASE
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
UNITED STATES AFRICA COMMAND