TX HCR1 | 2013 | 83rd Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, May 28, 2013, and ending on Monday, June 3, 2013.
Title
Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, May 28, 2013, and ending on Monday, June 3, 2013.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-06-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-06-21 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-06-20 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-06-17 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-06-17 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Read |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-28 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-28 | House | Adopted |
2013-05-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-05-28 | House | Filed |