TX HB981 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a study by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board on the feasibility of establishing a religious studies program at Texas Southern University.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a study by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board on the feasibility of establishing a religious studies program at Texas Southern University.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1602 (Y: 107 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#898 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15 Effective immediately
2021-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-29HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1602
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-26HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-26HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-26HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenatePassed
2021-05-24SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-24SenateRecord vote
2021-05-24SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-24SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-21SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Higher Education
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-08HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#898
2021-05-08HousePassed
2021-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-08HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-29HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-19HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-19HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-19HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-15HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Higher Education
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2021-01-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1635 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Referred to Higher Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB981
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00981I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00981S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00981F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00981I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00981H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00981E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00981E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00981S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00981S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00981F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB981&RcdVtNo=898&Ch=H&Dt=05/08/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-24-F.PDF#page=34
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB981&RcdVtNo=1602&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021

Bill Comments

feedback