TX HB977 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Considered in Calendars
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Considered in Calendars
Summary
Relating to use of the money from the Texas enterprise fund to promote renewable energy technology.
Title
Relating to use of the money from the Texas enterprise fund to promote renewable energy technology.
Sponsors
Rep. Lon Burnam [D] | Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-14 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-07 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-07 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time | |
2009-02-02 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB878 (Same As) 2009-03-09 - Referred to Economic Development
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
RENEWABLE ENERGY
TEXAS ENTERPRISE FUND
Business & Commerce--General
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
RENEWABLE ENERGY
TEXAS ENTERPRISE FUND