TX HB966 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to providing a sales and use tax refund or franchise tax credit for businesses that employ certain apprentices.
Title
Relating to providing a sales and use tax refund or franchise tax credit for businesses that employ certain apprentices.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Dutton [D] | Rep. Donna Howard [D] | Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] |
Rep. Tracy King [D] | Rep. Cecil Bell [R] | Sen. Cesar Blanco [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB685 (Same As) 2019-05-16 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Taxation
Taxation--Franchise
Taxation--Sales
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Taxation
Taxation--Franchise
Taxation--Sales
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB966 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00966I.htm |