TX HB941 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to state collaboration with federally recognized Indian tribes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to state collaboration with federally recognized Indian tribes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-24HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-04-01HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-04-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-03-28HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-03-07HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-03-07HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-03-07HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2013-03-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-03-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-03-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-03-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-19HouseReferred to State Affairs
2013-02-19HouseRead first time
2013-02-04HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback