TX HB937 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 57-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the carrying of handguns on the campuses of and certain other locations associated with institutions of higher education; amending provisions subject to a criminal penalty; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to the carrying of handguns on the campuses of and certain other locations associated with institutions of higher education; amending provisions subject to a criminal penalty; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-31 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-31 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2015-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CONCEALED HANDGUNS
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Private Schools
Weapons
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--Private Schools
Weapons