TX HB925 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the composition of the board of directors of the Gateway Groundwater Conservation District.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the composition of the board of directors of the Gateway Groundwater Conservation District.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26HouseLaid on the table subject to call
2019-04-26HouseCompanion considered in lieu of SB 872
2019-04-25HousePostponed 4/26/19 10:00 AM
2019-04-25HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-04-23HousePostponed 4/25/19 10:00 AM
2019-04-23HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-04-15HousePostponed 4/23/19 10:00 AM
2019-04-15HouseLaid out as postponed business
2019-03-26HousePostponed 4/15/19 10:00 AM
2019-03-26HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-26HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-03-21HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-15HouseRecommendations filed with the Speaker
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-14HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-12HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-05HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-05HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-05HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-25HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2019-02-25HouseRead first time
2019-02-07HouseTransmitted to the Governor
2019-01-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB872 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - Effective immediately

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback