TX HB914 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of certain municipal employees to request the removal and storage of certain abandoned or illegally parked vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of certain municipal employees to request the removal and storage of certain abandoned or illegally parked vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Read 3rd time RV#90 (Y: 128 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-04 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-04 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-22 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-22SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-19HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-19HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-19SenateRecord vote
2021-05-19SenatePassed
2021-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-19SenateRecord vote
2021-05-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-13SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-13SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-11SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-19SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-04-19SenateRead first time
2021-04-08SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-07HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-07HouseRecord vote RV#90
2021-04-07HousePassed
2021-04-07HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-06HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-06HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-06HouseAmended 1-Hernandez
2021-04-06HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-06HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-03-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-17HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-12-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1375 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB914
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00914I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00914E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00914S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00914F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00914H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00914I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00914H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00914E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00914E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB914&RcdVtNo=90&Ch=H&Dt=04/07/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-19-F1.PDF#page=3

Bill Comments 750

feedback