TX HB90 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance and suspension of a hardship driver's license.
Title
Relating to the issuance and suspension of a hardship driver's license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-29 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-29 | House discharges conferees-reported | |
2011-05-28 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2011-05-28 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-28 | Record vote | |
2011-05-28 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-05-28 | House discharges conferees | |
2011-05-28 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-05-26 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-26 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-26 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-26 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2011-05-25 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-25 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-25 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-25 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-25 | House requests conference committee | |
2011-05-25 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2011-05-24 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-24 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-24 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Passed | |
2011-05-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Amended | |
2011-05-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-24 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-24 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-21 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-20 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-05 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2011-05-05 | Read first time | |
2011-05-04 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-04 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-03 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-03 | Record vote | |
2011-05-03 | Passed | |
2011-05-03 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-02 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-02 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-05-02 | Amended | |
2011-05-02 | Amended | |
2011-05-02 | Amended | |
2011-05-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-02 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-28 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-05 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-04 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-22 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-22 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Vote reconsidered in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-22 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-08 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-08 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-08 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | |
2011-02-09 | Read first time | |
2010-11-08 | Filed |
Subjects
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses