TX HB9 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the criminal punishment and conditions of community supervision for the offense of obstructing a highway or other passageway; increasing a criminal penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the criminal punishment and conditions of community supervision for the offense of obstructing a highway or other passageway; increasing a criminal penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#790 (Y: 90 N: 55 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#772 (Y: 84 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#771 (Y: 58 N: 80 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#469 (Y: 63 N: 82 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#468 (Y: 64 N: 82 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-01 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenatePassed
2021-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-18SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-10SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-06HouseRecord vote RV#790
2021-05-06HousePassed
2021-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-05HouseRecord vote RV#772
2021-05-05HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-05HouseRecord vote RV#771
2021-05-05HouseAmendment fails of adoption 1-A. Johnson
2021-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-05HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2021-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-29HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-29HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-27HouseRecommitted to committee
2021-04-27HouseAmendment fails of adoption 4-A. Johnson
2021-04-27HouseRecord vote RV#469
2021-04-27HouseAmendment fails of adoption 3-Meza
2021-04-27HouseAmendment fails of adoption 2-Crockett
2021-04-27HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-27HouseRecord vote RV#468
2021-04-27HouseAmendment fails of adoption 1-Meza
2021-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-27HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2021-04-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2021-02-25HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1163 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Criminal Justice

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB9
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00009I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00009H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00009E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00009S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00009F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00009H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00009H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00009H23.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00009H24.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00009I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00009H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00009H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00009E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00009E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB9&RcdVtNo=468&Ch=H&Dt=04/27/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB9&RcdVtNo=469&Ch=H&Dt=04/27/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB9&RcdVtNo=771&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB9&RcdVtNo=772&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB9&RcdVtNo=790&Ch=H&Dt=05/06/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=4

Bill Comments

feedback