TX HB892 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the right of certain facility residents to designate an essential caregiver for in-person visitation.
Title
Relating to the right of certain facility residents to designate an essential caregiver for in-person visitation.
Sponsors
Rep. James Frank [R] | Rep. Scott Sanford [R] | Rep. Ana Hernandez [D] | Rep. William Metcalf [R] |
Rep. Trent Ashby [R] | Rep. Briscoe Cain [R] | Rep. David Cook [R] | Rep. Jake Ellzey [R] |
Rep. Cole Hefner [R] | Sen. Mayes Middleton [R] | Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] | Rep. Candy Noble [R] |
Rep. Hugh Shine [R] | Rep. Cody Vasut [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-12-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB267 (Same As) 2021-03-03 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB25 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
HB2897 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Human Services
SB25 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
HB2897 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Human Services
Subjects
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Nursing Homes
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Nursing Homes