TX HB2897 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Referred to Human Services
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Referred to Human Services
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the right of certain facility residents to designate an essential caregiver for in-person visitation.
Title
Relating to the right of certain facility residents to designate an essential caregiver for in-person visitation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB25 (Same As) 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
SB267 (Same As) 2021-03-03 - Referred to Health & Human Services
HB892 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Left pending in committee
SB267 (Same As) 2021-03-03 - Referred to Health & Human Services
HB892 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Nursing Homes
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Nursing Homes
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB2897 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB02897I.htm |