TX HB885 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the requirements for a junior college district to receive approval from the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board to offer baccalaureate degree programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the requirements for a junior college district to receive approval from the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board to offer baccalaureate degree programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1555 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#171 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15 Effective immediately
2021-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-31 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-29HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-28SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-28HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-28HouseRecord vote RV#1555
2021-05-28HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-05-23HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-23HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-23HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenatePassed
2021-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-21SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-14SenateReferred to Higher Education
2021-04-14SenateRead first time
2021-04-13SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-13HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-13HouseRecord vote RV#171
2021-04-13HousePassed
2021-04-13HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-12HousePassed to engrossment
2021-04-12HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-12HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-09HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-07HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-25HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-25HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Higher Education
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-12-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB740 (Similar To) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Higher Education
SB740 (Similar To) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Higher Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB885
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00885I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00885H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00885E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00885S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00885F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00885I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00885H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00885H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00885E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00885E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00885S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00885S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00885F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB885&RcdVtNo=171&Ch=H&Dt=04/13/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=24
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB885&RcdVtNo=1555&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback