TX HB870 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to Medicaid telemedicine and telehealth services.
Title
Relating to Medicaid telemedicine and telehealth services.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R] | Rep. Trent Ashby [R] |
Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Stephen Allison [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB670 (Same As) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
TELEMEDICINE
Human Services
Human Services--Medical Assistance
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
TELEMEDICINE