TX HB87 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to regulation of an individual's occupation.
Title
Relating to regulation of an individual's occupation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-29 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-29 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-29 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2013-04-26 | House | Recommitted to committee |
2013-04-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-02-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-02-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-02-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-02-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-05 | House | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform |
2013-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2012-11-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Business & Commerce--Small Business & Minority Business
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions