TX HB866 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration to public school students in certain grades of state-administered assessment instruments.
Title
Relating to the administration to public school students in certain grades of state-administered assessment instruments.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Huberty [R] | Rep. Sylvester Turner [D] | Rep. Byron Cook [R] | Sen. Borris Miles [D] |
Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] | Rep. Justin Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Kel Seliger [R] | Sen. Dan Patrick [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - House - HB 866Third Reading House (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - HB 866Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-03 - House - HB 866Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | See remarks for effective date | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-23 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2013-05-23 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2013-05-23 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-23 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2013-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-03 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-03 | House | Passed |
2013-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-05-02 | House | Amended |
2013-05-02 | House | Amended |
2013-05-02 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2013-05-01 | House | Postponed |
2013-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-29 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2013-04-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2013-02-19 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-31 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing