TX HB864 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the punishment for the offense of evading arrest or detention.
Title
Relating to the punishment for the offense of evading arrest or detention.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-19 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-18 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-02-24 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2011-02-24 | Read first time | |
2011-01-25 | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB864 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB00864I.htm |