TX HB840 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-24)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of a bundled-pricing program to reduce certain health care costs in the state employees group benefits program.
Title
Relating to the establishment of a bundled-pricing program to reduce certain health care costs in the state employees group benefits program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-09 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-01 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2023-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2022-12-01 | House | Filed |
Subjects
EMPLOYEE BENEFITS & LEAVE
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--State Employees
State Employees
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--State Employees
State Employees