TX HB834 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-07 - Referred to Economic Development
Pending: Senate Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-07 - Referred to Economic Development
Pending: Senate Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of the Texas Fast Start Program to promote rapid delivery of workforce education and development.
Title
Relating to the establishment of the Texas Fast Start Program to promote rapid delivery of workforce education and development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Economic Development |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-11 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-10 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-04-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-04-04 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-03-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-03-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-03-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-14 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-07 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2013-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-30 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Junior College Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
TECHNICAL EDUCATION
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Education--Junior College Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
TECHNICAL EDUCATION
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS