TX HB800 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-14 - No action taken in committee
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-14 - No action taken in committee
Summary
Relating to a physician's delegation of prescriptive authority to physician assistants or advanced practice nurses.
Title
Relating to a physician's delegation of prescriptive authority to physician assistants or advanced practice nurses.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Jackson [R] | Rep. Diana Maldonado [D] | Rep. Rob Orr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-14 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Public Health | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time | |
2009-01-26 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB532 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
HB2709 (Same As) 2009-03-17 - Referred to Public Health
HB2709 (Same As) 2009-03-17 - Referred to Public Health
Subjects
Health Care Providers
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANTS
PHYSICIANS
PRESCRIPTIONS
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANTS
PHYSICIANS
PRESCRIPTIONS