TX HB770 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of poker clubs in certain counties; providing civil penalties; authorizing an occupational license; authorizing a fee; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to the regulation of poker clubs in certain counties; providing civil penalties; authorizing an occupational license; authorizing a fee; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-03-29 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-12-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
County Government
County Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
GAMBLING
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
County Government
County Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
GAMBLING
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions