TX HB744 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to the restoration of the medically needy program under the state Medicaid program.
Title
Relating to the restoration of the medically needy program under the state Medicaid program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-04 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-28 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-28 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-19 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-19 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Human Services | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time | |
2009-01-22 | Filed |