TX HB737 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-25 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-25 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of regional emergency communications districts; authorizing the issuance of bonds; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to the creation of regional emergency communications districts; authorizing the issuance of bonds; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - House - HB 737Third Reading House (Y: 99 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-29 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-29 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-29 | House | Passed |
2015-04-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-28 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-28 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-04-28 | House | Amended |
2015-04-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-28 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-20 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-08 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-08 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-23 | House | Referred to Special Purpose Districts |
2015-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-15 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Health--General
Political Subdivisions
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Health--General
Political Subdivisions
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous