TX HB715 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .

Summary

Relating to motor vehicle inspection stations that perform emissions inspections using only the onboard diagnostic system of inspected vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to motor vehicle inspection stations that perform emissions inspections using only the onboard diagnostic system of inspected vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-06-19 Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
2009-06-19 Signed by the Governor
2009-06-04 Sent to the Governor
2009-06-03 Signed in the Senate
2009-06-03 Signed in the House
2009-06-03 Reported enrolled
2009-06-01 Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2009-06-01 Record vote
2009-06-01 Senate adopts conference committee report
2009-05-31 House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2009-05-31 Record vote
2009-05-31 House adopts conference committee report
2009-05-30 Conference committee report filed
2009-05-30 Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
2009-05-30 Senate appoints conferees-reported
2009-05-30 Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
2009-05-30 Senate appoints conferees
2009-05-30 Senate grants request for conference comm.
2009-05-30 House appoints conferees-reported
2009-05-30 House requests conference committee-reported
2009-05-30 House refuses to concur-reported
2009-05-29 House appoints conferees
2009-05-29 House requests conference committee
2009-05-29 House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2009-05-28 Senate Amendments printed and distributed
2009-05-28 Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
2009-05-28 Senate passage as amended reported
2009-05-25 Record vote
2009-05-25 Passed as amended
2009-05-25 Vote recorded in Journal
2009-05-25 Amendment adopted as amended
2009-05-25 Vote recorded in Journal
2009-05-25 Amendment amended
2009-05-25 Amendment to amendment offered
2009-05-25 Vote recorded in Journal
2009-05-25 Amendment amended
2009-05-25 Amendment to amendment offered
2009-05-25 Amendment(s) offered
2009-05-25 Vote recorded in Journal
2009-05-25 Amended
2009-05-25 Amendment(s) offered
2009-05-25 Read 3rd time
2009-05-25 Record vote
2009-05-25 Three day rule suspended
2009-05-25 Record vote
2009-05-25 Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2009-05-25 Vote recorded in Journal
2009-05-25 Rules suspended-Regular order of business
2009-05-25 Placed on intent calendar
2009-05-18 Not again placed on intent calendar
2009-05-15 Placed on intent calendar
2009-05-13 Committee report printed and distributed
2009-05-13 Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
2009-05-13 Reported favorably as substituted
2009-05-12 Considered in public hearing
2009-05-12 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-05-12 Left pending in committee
2009-05-12 Testimony taken in committee
2009-05-12 Considered in public hearing
2009-05-12 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-05-04 Referred to Natural Resources
2009-05-04 Read first time
2009-04-29 Received from the House
2009-04-29 Reported engrossed
2009-04-28 Record vote
2009-04-28 Passed
2009-04-28 Read 3rd time
2009-04-28 Passed to engrossment as amended
2009-04-28 Amended
2009-04-28 Read 2nd time
2009-04-28 Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2009-04-24 Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
2009-04-16 Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2009-04-15 Committee report printed and distributed
2009-04-15 Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2009-03-31 Reported favorably as substituted
2009-03-31 Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2009-03-31 Committee substitute considered in committee
2009-03-31 Considered in public hearing
2009-03-24 Left pending in committee
2009-03-24 Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2009-03-24 Considered in public hearing
2009-03-24 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-02-19 Referred to Transportation
2009-02-19 Read first time
2009-01-22 Filed

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback