TX HB703 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing a revocable deed that transfers real property at the transferor's death.
Title
Relating to authorizing a revocable deed that transfers real property at the transferor's death.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-08 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2015-05-08 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-05-01 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-07 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-31 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-03-31 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-31 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-03-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-23 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2015-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Probate
Probate--Wills & Admin of Estates
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
TEXAS REAL PROPERTY TRANSFER ON DEATH ACT
Probate--Wills & Admin of Estates
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
TEXAS REAL PROPERTY TRANSFER ON DEATH ACT