TX HB700 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Preparation for Adult Living Program and other services for foster children transitioning to independent living.
Title
Relating to the Preparation for Adult Living Program and other services for foster children transitioning to independent living.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1617 (Y: 138 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#821 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#821 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#1617 |
2021-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-26 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Powell |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-06 | House | Record vote RV#821 |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed |
2021-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-12-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
EDUCATION--HIGHER--CURRICULUM
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
FOSTER CARE
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Housing
Housing--General
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Education--Higher
EDUCATION--HIGHER--CURRICULUM
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
FOSTER CARE
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Housing
Housing--General
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety