TX HB700 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the use of the skills development fund by certain entities and a study and report regarding the effectiveness of that fund.
Title
Relating to the use of the skills development fund by certain entities and a study and report regarding the effectiveness of that fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1968 (Y: 111 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#752 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1968 (Y: 111 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#752 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-26 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#1968 |
2019-05-26 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-26 | House | House adopts resolution to go outside bounds HR 2181 |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds SR 835 |
2019-05-25 | House | Corrected Conference Committee Report distributed |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Corrected Conference committee report filed |
2019-05-25 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2019-05-19 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-19 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2019-05-19 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2019-05-17 | House | House appoints conferees |
2019-05-17 | House | House requests conference committee |
2019-05-17 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-14 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Powell |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-26 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#752 |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-26 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-15 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-02 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2019-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB352 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
Education
Education--School Districts
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Libraries & Librarians
TEXAS A&M ENGINEERING EXTENSION SERVICE
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT BOARDS
Education--School Districts
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Libraries & Librarians
TEXAS A&M ENGINEERING EXTENSION SERVICE
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT BOARDS