TX HB694 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to coverage for supplemental breast cancer screening under certain health benefit plans.
Title
Relating to coverage for supplemental breast cancer screening under certain health benefit plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-23 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2015-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
MAMMOGRAPHY
Women
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
MAMMOGRAPHY
Women