TX HB684 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the care of students with seizure disorders and the training requirements for certain school personnel regarding seizure recognition and related first aid.
Title
Relating to the care of students with seizure disorders and the training requirements for certain school personnel regarding seizure recognition and related first aid.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1962 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#375 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1962 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#375 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-26 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#1962 |
2019-05-26 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-25 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2019-05-22 | House | House appoints conferees |
2019-05-22 | House | House requests conference committee |
2019-05-22 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-14 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-14 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#375 |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed |
2019-04-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-15 | House | Amended 1-Clardy |
2019-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-15 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-26 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-26 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1044 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Education
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
SAM'S LAW
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
SAM'S LAW