TX HB679 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to limitations on the use of workers' compensation insurance experience modifier values in soliciting and awarding public construction contracts.
Title
Relating to limitations on the use of workers' compensation insurance experience modifier values in soliciting and awarding public construction contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Bell [R] | Rep. Cecil Bell [R] | Rep. Ed Thompson [R] | Rep. Stan Lambert [R] |
Rep. Ramon Romero [D] | Sen. Charles Schwertner [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-19 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1876 (Y: 133 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#475 (Y: 141 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - Amended RV#440 (Y: 125 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#475 (Y: 141 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - Amended RV#440 (Y: 125 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-09 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-19 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-19 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2023-05-19 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2023-05-19 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-19 | House | Record vote RV#1876 |
2023-05-19 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2023-05-17 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2023-05-17 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2023-05-17 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-25 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#475 |
2023-04-25 | House | Passed |
2023-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-24 | House | Record vote RV#440 |
2023-04-24 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-04-24 | House | Amended 1-K. Bell |
2023-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-15 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Labor
Labor--Workers' Compensation
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Labor--Workers' Compensation
Purchasing
Purchasing--Local
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions