TX HB673 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to notice and opportunity to cure that must be given before filing an eviction suit.
Title
Relating to notice and opportunity to cure that must be given before filing an eviction suit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-05-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-05-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |