TX HB664 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-10 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the release on bail of a defendant arrested following a violation of a condition of community supervision.
Title
Relating to the release on bail of a defendant arrested following a violation of a condition of community supervision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#635 (Y: 121 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-02 | House | Amended |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-25 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2017-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2016-12-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION