TX HB662 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-17 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-17 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration of the homeless housing and services program by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
Title
Relating to the administration of the homeless housing and services program by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1191 (Y: 75 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1191 |
2021-05-14 | House | Passed |
2021-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-13 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-13 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-25 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--Homeless Persons
City Government--General
Housing
HOUSING & COMMUNITY AFFAIRS, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing--Homeless Persons