TX HB655 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the storage and recovery of water in aquifers; authorizing fees and surcharges; adding provisions subject to a criminal penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the storage and recovery of water in aquifers; authorizing fees and surcharges; adding provisions subject to a criminal penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-21 - House - HB 655Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - HB 655Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 1 by Raney (Y: 121 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-16 Effective immediately
2015-06-16 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-23HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-22HouseReported enrolled
2015-05-22SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2015-05-21HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2015-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-21HouseRecord vote
2015-05-21HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2015-05-19HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2015-05-19HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2015-05-18HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2015-05-18SenateRecord vote
2015-05-18SenatePassed
2015-05-18SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-18SenateRecord vote
2015-05-18SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-18SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2015-05-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-18SenateAmended
2015-05-18SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-05-18SenateRead 2nd time
2015-05-18SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2015-05-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-18SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-05-14SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-05-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-12SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2015-05-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-05-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-05SenateReferred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
2015-05-05SenateRead first time
2015-04-23SenateReceived from the House
2015-04-22HouseReported engrossed
2015-04-22HouseRecord vote
2015-04-22HousePassed
2015-04-22HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-21HousePassed to engrossment
2015-04-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-21HouseRecord vote
2015-04-21HouseAmendment tabled
2015-04-21HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-04-16HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-04-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-04-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-14HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-08HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-02-19HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2015-02-19HouseRead first time
2015-01-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB655
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00655I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00655H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00655E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00655S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00655F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB655&RcdVtNo=311&Ch=H&Dt=04/21/2015
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB655&RcdVtNo=320&Ch=H&Dt=04/22/2015
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB655&RcdVtNo=1267&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2015

Bill Comments 750

feedback