TX HB650 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to inmates of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to inmates of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1355 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#240 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-05-23 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-14SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-14HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-14SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-13HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-13HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-13HouseRecord vote RV#1355
2019-05-13HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-10HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-10HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-10HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenatePassed
2019-05-10SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-10SenateRecord vote
2019-05-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-10SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-10SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-02SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-02SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-02SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-01SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-16SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-04-16SenateRereferred to committee
2019-04-15SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-04-15SenateRead first time
2019-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-10HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-10HouseRecord vote RV#240
2019-04-10HousePassed
2019-04-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-09HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-09HouseAmendment adopted as amended 2-White
2019-04-09HouseAmendment amended 3-Toth
2019-04-09HouseAmendment(s) offered 2-White
2019-04-09HouseAmended 1-White
2019-04-09HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-27HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-20HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-14HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-07HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-07HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-07HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-07HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Corrections
2019-02-21HouseRead first time
2019-01-04HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback