TX HB636 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-17)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas State Board of Plumbing Examiners; authorizing a fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the continuation and functions of the Texas State Board of Plumbing Examiners; authorizing a fee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Amendment tabled (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Amendment tabled (Y: 15 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#187 (Y: 143 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#178 (Y: 140 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Amendment adopted as amended RV#177 (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#176 (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26 Effective immediately
2021-05-26 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-14SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-14HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-13HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-13HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-13SenateRecord vote
2021-05-13SenatePassed
2021-05-13SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-13SenateRecord vote
2021-05-13SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-13SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-13SenatePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-13SenateRecord vote
2021-05-13SenateAmendment tabled
2021-05-13SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Nichols
2021-05-13SenateRecord vote
2021-05-13SenateAmendment tabled
2021-05-13SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Nichols
2021-05-13SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-13SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-13SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-12SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-11SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-06SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-06SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-21SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2021-04-21SenateRead first time
2021-04-14SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-14HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-14HouseRecord vote RV#187
2021-04-14HousePassed
2021-04-14HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-13HouseRecord vote RV#178
2021-04-13HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-13HouseRecord vote RV#177
2021-04-13HouseAmendment adopted as amended 3-Schaefer
2021-04-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-04-13HouseRecord vote RV#176
2021-04-13HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2021-04-13HouseAmendment amended 4-Schaefer
2021-04-13HouseAmendment(s) offered 3-Schaefer
2021-04-13HouseAmended 2-S. Thompson
2021-04-13HouseAmended 1-S. Thompson
2021-04-13HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-13HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2021-04-09HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-03-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-10HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-01HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2021-03-01HouseRead first time
2020-11-24HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1196 (Same As) 2021-05-04 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB636
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00636I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00636H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00636E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00636S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00636F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00636H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00636H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00636H23.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00636H24.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00636S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB00636S2F2.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00636I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00636H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB00636E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB00636E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB636&RcdVtNo=176&Ch=H&Dt=04/13/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB636&RcdVtNo=177&Ch=H&Dt=04/13/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB636&RcdVtNo=178&Ch=H&Dt=04/13/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB636&RcdVtNo=187&Ch=H&Dt=04/14/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-13-F.PDF#page=22
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-13-F.PDF#page=23

Bill Comments

feedback