TX HB634 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the verification of an inmate's veteran status by the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
Title
Relating to the verification of an inmate's veteran status by the Texas Department of Criminal Justice.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-16 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-15 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-15 | House | Senate passage reported |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-07 | Senate | No action taken in committee |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-03 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-03 | House | Passed |
2013-04-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-02 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-04-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-03-24 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-03-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-03-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-03-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-03-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-02-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-02-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2013-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-23 | House | Filed |