TX HB63 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-10)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the criminal and licensing consequences of certain marihuana possession and drug paraphernalia possession offenses; imposing a fee.
Title
Relating to the criminal and licensing consequences of certain marihuana possession and drug paraphernalia possession offenses; imposing a fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#801 (Y: 103 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - Amendment adopted as amended RV#780 (Y: 98 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - Amendment adopted as amended RV#780 (Y: 98 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-30 | House | Record vote RV#801 |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed |
2019-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-29 | House | Record vote RV#780 |
2019-04-29 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-29 | House | Amendment adopted as amended 1-Moody |
2019-04-29 | House | Amendment amended 2-Moody |
2019-04-29 | House | Amendment(s) offered 1-Moody |
2019-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB156 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Family
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
Law Enforcement
MARIHUANA
PEACE OFFICERS
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Family
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
Law Enforcement
MARIHUANA
PEACE OFFICERS