TX HB596 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the composition of the board of trustees of the Employees Retirement System of Texas.
Title
Relating to the composition of the board of trustees of the Employees Retirement System of Texas.
Sponsors
Rep. Ana Hernandez [D] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#213 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-09 | House | Record vote RV#213 |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed |
2019-04-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2018-12-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF TEXAS
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--General
Retirement Systems--State Employees
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--General
Retirement Systems--State Employees