TX HB582 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-11 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sale of fireworks on and before the Juneteenth holiday.
Title
Relating to the sale of fireworks on and before the Juneteenth holiday.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2018-12-20 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
County Government
County Government--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Safety
Safety--Fireworks
TEXAS A&M FOREST SERVICE
County Government
County Government--General
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
Safety
Safety--Fireworks
TEXAS A&M FOREST SERVICE