TX HB579 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-08 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-08 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to notice by a state agency regarding certain contracts for which the total value exceeds that of the initial contract.
Title
Relating to notice by a state agency regarding certain contracts for which the total value exceeds that of the initial contract.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - Amended RV#680 (Y: 92 N: 52 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Amended RV#617 (Y: 69 N: 64 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Amended RV#617 (Y: 69 N: 64 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed as amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Amended |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-02 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-02 | House | Amended |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-28 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2017-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2016-12-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Governor
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Legislature
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Governor
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Legislature
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions