TX HB552 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the inclusion of diminished value in the minimum motor vehicle liability insurance coverage requirement.
Title
Relating to the inclusion of diminished value in the minimum motor vehicle liability insurance coverage requirement.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Thompson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-19 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-12 | House | Filed |