TX HB5408 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-03 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Pending: House Land & Resource Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-03 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Pending: House Land & Resource Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Knob Creek Municipal Utility District of Bell County; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Knob Creek Municipal Utility District of Bell County; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-03 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-05-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-25 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2023-04-25 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-24 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2023-04-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2605 (Same As) 2023-06-16 - Vetoed by the Governor
SB2605 (Same As) 2023-06-16 - Vetoed by the Governor
SB2605 (Same As) 2023-06-16 - Vetoed by the Governor
Subjects
KNOB CREEK MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT OF BELL COUNTY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility