TX SB2605 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the Knob Creek Municipal Utility District of Bell County; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the Knob Creek Municipal Utility District of Bell County; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#2039 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-16 Vetoed by the Governor
2023-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2023-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2023-05-28SenateSigned in the Senate
2023-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2023-05-25SenateHouse passage reported
2023-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2023-05-24HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2023-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#2039
2023-05-24HousePassed
2023-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2023-05-24HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2023-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2023-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2023-05-24HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2023-05-20HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2023-05-19HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2023-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2023-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2023-05-17SenateRecommendations filed with the Senate
2023-05-09HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2023-05-09HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2023-05-09HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2023-05-04HouseReferred to Land & Resource Management
2023-05-04HouseRead first time
2023-05-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2023-05-03SenateReported engrossed
2023-05-03SenateRecord vote
2023-05-03SenatePassed
2023-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2023-05-03SenateRecord vote
2023-05-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2023-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2023-05-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2023-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2023-05-03SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2023-05-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2023-05-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2023-04-28SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2023-04-28SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2023-04-27SenateVote taken in committee
2023-04-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2023-04-27SenateLeft pending in committee
2023-04-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2023-04-27SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-04-13SenateReferred to Local Government
2023-04-13SenateRead first time
2023-04-13SenateTransmitted to the Governor
2023-04-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB5408 (Same As) 2023-05-03 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
HB5408 (Same As) 2023-05-03 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SB2605
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB02605I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB02605S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB02605E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB02605H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/SB02605F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/SB02605I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/fiscalnotes/html/SB02605I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/SB02605H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/analysis/html/SB02605F.htm
Roll Callhttps://journals.senate.texas.gov/sjrnl/88r/pdf/88RSJ05-03-F.PDF#page=37
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=SB2605&RcdVtNo=2039&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2023

Bill Comments

feedback