TX HB5394 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers, duties, territory, and governance of the Westwood Magnolia Parkway Improvement District.
Title
Relating to the powers, duties, territory, and governance of the Westwood Magnolia Parkway Improvement District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1308 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1308 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-09 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2023-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-24 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-19 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-19 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-09 | House | Record vote RV#1308 |
2023-05-09 | House | Passed |
2023-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-09 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-05-06 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-05-06 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-27 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-20 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2023-04-20 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-19 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2023-04-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2618 (Same As) 2023-05-26 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
SB2618 (Same As) 2023-05-26 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
SB2618 (Same As) 2023-05-26 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Subjects
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
WESTWOOD MAGNOLIA PARKWAY IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
WESTWOOD MAGNOLIA PARKWAY IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT