TX HB5322 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration, powers, territory, and financing of the Garfield Municipal Utility District No. 1.
Title
Relating to the administration, powers, territory, and financing of the Garfield Municipal Utility District No. 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1580 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1580 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-18 | Effective immediately | |
2023-06-18 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2023-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-25 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-12 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-12 | House | Record vote RV#1580 |
2023-05-12 | House | Passed |
2023-05-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-12 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-12 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-12 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-05-10 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-05-06 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-03 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-05-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-24 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2023-03-27 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2023-03-27 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-27 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2023-03-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
GARFIELD MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 1
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility