TX HB525 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to databases that contain information regarding certain violent offenses or filed protective orders.
Title
Relating to databases that contain information regarding certain violent offenses or filed protective orders.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Villalba [R] | Sen. Carol Alvarado [D] | Rep. Geanie Morrison [R] | Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] |
Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1161 (Y: 133 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-11 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | House | Passed |
2017-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-10 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-10 | House | Amended |
2017-05-10 | House | Amended |
2017-05-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-24 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2016-12-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
Family
Family--Family Violence
INTERNET
Law Enforcement
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Family
Family--Family Violence
INTERNET
Law Enforcement
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF